judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00208-CV
11-89-00208-CV
07/11/1989
Contract
Grisson, Doreen Abraham
Walker, Wayne and Michael E. Shelton
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/26/1990Mandate issued
04/20/1990Case returned from higher court
03/21/1990Application for writ of error disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/16/1990Case forwarded to higher court
02/14/1990Application fee paid
02/14/1990Express fee paid
02/09/1990Application fee requested
02/09/1990Application for writ of error
01/11/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
12/29/1989Mot. - For rehearing filed
12/14/1989Submitted
12/14/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/14/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/26/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Grisson, Doreen AbrahamAppellant
Michael SheltonAppellee
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
Honorable Richard Millard
87-07658