judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00205-CV
11-89-00205-CV
07/11/1989
Wills & Estates
Musick, Steven Patrick and John Kenneth Musick
Reynolds, Joe et al
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/28/1991Mandate issued
03/26/1991Case returned from higher court
02/20/1991Application for writ of error disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/04/1991Case forwarded to higher court
12/31/1990Application fee paid
12/31/1990Application for writ of error
12/31/1990Express fee paid
12/21/1990Application fee paid
12/21/1990Application for writ of error
12/21/1990Express fee paid
11/29/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
11/06/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
10/25/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
10/25/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
10/25/1990Case reinstated
10/25/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/25/1990Former opinion withdrawn
10/25/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/24/1990Response to motion, brief, etc. filed
10/11/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
10/11/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
09/27/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
09/27/1990Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
09/27/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/27/1990Case reinstated
09/27/1990Former opinion withdrawn
09/27/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/13/1990Response to motion, brief, etc. filed
05/24/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
05/23/1990Mot. - For rehearing filed
05/10/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/04/1989Submitted
10/04/1989Submission set in Eastland
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/28/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Reynolds, Joe Et AlAppelleeJoe H. Reynolds
Kay K. Morgan
J. Bruce Bennett
Reynolds, Joe Etc.AppelleeKay K. Daniel Pierce
Musick, Steven Patrick & JohnAppellantBob Heath
Trial Court Information
165th District Court
Harris
Honorable Kenneth D Harrison
85-27693