judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00199-CV
11-89-00199-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Patterson, Connie and Margo Kochran
Steitz & Corbett Personnel Group, Inc.
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/30/1990Record checked out
08/30/1990Miscellaneous motion disposedWrit or Motion Granted in Part
08/20/1990Miscellaneous motion filed
04/24/1990We send letter to lawyers, etc.
04/16/1990Mandate issued
04/12/1990Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/12/1990Cancellation of submission date
03/30/1990Response to motion, brief, etc. filed
03/30/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/29/1990Mot. - To dismiss appeal filed
03/27/1990Phone call - we receive from lawyers, etc.
09/08/1989Letter filed from . . .
09/08/1989Cancellation of submission date
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/16/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Steitz & CorbettAppellee
Kockran, MargoAppellantClarence F. Kendall II
Patterson, ConnieAppellantP. J. Murphey Harmon
Trial Court Information
334th District Court
Harris
88,53145