judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00198-CR
11-89-00198-CR
07/11/1989
Burglary
Cumby, Frank Lee
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/12/1994Record checked in
06/06/1994Record checked out
04/26/1990Mandate issued
04/25/1990Case returned from higher court
03/28/1990Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case disposedRefused
01/05/1990Miscellaneous filing
01/04/1990Case forwarded to higher court
01/04/1990Miscellaneous motion disposedOverruled
01/02/1990Miscellaneous motion filed
01/02/1990Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case
12/07/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/12/1989Supp. brief filed
10/12/1989Mot. - To file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/1989Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article
10/06/1989Supplemental Brief received - not filed
10/02/1989Submitted
10/02/1989Submission set in Eastland
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/26/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
Honorable Wallace Moore
500880
25 yrs. TDC