judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00194-CV
11-89-00194-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Teachworth, Walter
Wood, J. Carroll and Cheryl Wood
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/04/1991Mandate issued
11/08/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/21/1990Submitted
05/21/1990Submission set in Eastland
04/10/1990Letter filed from . . .
04/04/1990Letter filed from . . .
03/27/1990Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wood, J. Carroll & Cheryl WoodAppelleeGerson D. Bloom
Teachworth, WalterAppellantRobert V. Shattuck, Jr.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Galveston
Honorable Ronald Wilson
36,874