judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KNIGHT (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33445
Short Caption:KNIGHT (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C133624Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/07/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/10/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/10/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00312
12/30/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
01/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request due: 10 days. 99-00176
03/08/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Answer to Order to Show Cause Filed January 12, 1999. 99-01590
03/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, serve and file a transcript request form. The clerk shall forthwith file the docketing statement, provisionally submitted on march 8, 1999. 99-01913
03/16/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-01591
03/18/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 07/16/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 99-01968
03/24/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 7/16/98, 10/7/98. To Court Reporters: Maureen Schorn/Joey D'Amato. 99-02120
03/31/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 3, 1999. 99-02373
04/13/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. July 16, 1998 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 99-02808
05/04/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-03549
05/04/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. 99-03552
06/02/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-04565
07/07/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-05998
02/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-01878
02/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Case submitted on the record and briefs this day.
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14005
09/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14122
09/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14122