judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT L. PITTS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1309
Short Caption:ROBERT L. PITTS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD1628-10Filed Date:10/22/2010

Opening Event Date:10/22/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert L. Pitts YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/01/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Chantal Jean-Baptiste, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/01/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Chantal Jena-Baptiste, Esquire
12/07/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo)
12/07/2010RECEIVED - statement regarding transcript
12/20/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (By: JAC)
12/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt orderd/needed)dfe
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (150pgs/Tape) 10/20/10 proc. w/CD
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/18/2011APPENDIX
02/14/2011LETTER -from aplt re: attorney
02/15/2011LETTER referring to counsel for appellant the Feb. 14 pro se letter from appellant. (JC)
02/22/2011RECEIVED - pleading from aplt which he wants the information included in the brief filed by court appointed counsel (dwm)
02/22/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/23/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
02/28/2011LETTER referring to counsel for appellant the Feb. 22 pro se pleading from appellant. (JC)
03/02/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE-to aple's motion for summary affirmance until April 18, 2011 (no oppo)
03/08/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED to the extent that APPELLANT'S RESPONSE shall be filed NO LATER THAN MARCH 31, 2011. (CASTILLO) LW
03/09/2011LETTER - courtsey copy of letter from counsel to appellant (submitted by appellant)with statement by appellant attached.
03/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (substitution of counsel) (see ltr attached) LODGED PRO SE
03/18/2011LETTER referring to counsel for appellant the March 14 pro se motion for appointment of counsel filed by appellant and directing counsel to respond within 20 days. (TN)
03/31/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS Denied
04/14/2011ORD DNY COUNSEL MO TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASON without prejudice to its renewal, within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a statement of appellant pro se in accordance with Johnson v. United States, 513 A.2d 798 (D.C. 1986) or a detailed statement of counsel outling the basis for the conflict, the later statement can be filed as a separate document under seal. (By: ETW)
05/12/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
05/12/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (RZTHPR)
05/17/2011APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FL PETITION FOR REH/EB (no oppo)
05/20/2011ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH EB on or before June 20, 2011. (WH)
05/31/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
06/16/2011APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FL PETITION FOR REH/EB (no time specified).
06/21/2011ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH EB on or before July 21, 2011. (WH)
07/14/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
09/21/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for rehearing en banc
10/07/2011FiledMandate