judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0999-89
PD-0999-89
07/11/1989
PDR Case Type
BOYD, WARREN NATHAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/11/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/11/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateStephen C. Howard
BOYD, WARREN NATHANApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Dennis Powell
Court of Appeals Information:
09-88-00321-CR
Aff 6-14-89
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
260th District Court
Orange
Honorable BUDDIE J. HAHN
D-880,215