judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00222-CR
11-89-00222-CR
07/11/1989
All Misdemeanors
Sloan, Robert L.
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1990Mandate issued
11/22/1989Opinion issued
11/22/1989Opinion issued
11/22/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/02/1989Submitted
10/02/1989Submission set in Eastland
08/31/1989Submission set in Eastland
08/29/1989Letter filed from . . .
08/09/1989Phone call - we receive from lawyers, etc.
08/09/1989Case ready to be set
08/04/1989Inquiring on status, etc. of case
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No. 10
Harris
Honorable Sherman Ross, Judge
4115
$200 fine