judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CITY PLAN DEVELOPMENT VS. CLARK COUNTY

Case Information: 38236
Short Caption:CITY PLAN DEVELOPMENT VS. CLARK COUNTYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A430331Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/06/2001 / Hoppe, CraigSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/13/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/26/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Orin G. Grossman--check no. 57477.
07/26/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12671
08/06/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. - MISSING - 01-13207
08/06/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from the Clark County Clerk - the cost bond has been paid by Orin Grossman. - MISSING - 01-13282
08/06/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Craig A. Hoppe. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/08/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Craig A. Hoppe.
10/29/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-18097
11/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-19257
11/28/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-19876
03/04/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 3/1/02. Signed by Orin G. Grossman. 02-03896
03/04/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-03897
04/04/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: April 24, 2002. 02-05986
04/25/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 04/24/02. Signed by: Robert J. Gower. 02-07310
04/25/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-07311
05/24/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 05/23/02. 02-09166
12/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-21309
12/13/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB.
02/04/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-01870
03/04/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-02068
03/04/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/17/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 6, 2003. 03-02068