judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNETH NATHANIEL SPAGNER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0105)
Case Number:S-08-0105Case Docketed On:05/21/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KENNETH NATHANIEL SPAGNER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KENNETH NATHANIEL SPAGNER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKenneth Nathaniel SpagnerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig
Eric Thompson
Eric Alan Johnson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure
Opinion Number:2009 WY 12
Citation:200 P.3d 793

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/21/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/21/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/10/2008Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other Amended Order to proceed IFP and appointing the State Public Defender's OfficeRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
07/08/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/09/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - Eric Thompson on behalf of the State of WyomingNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
08/20/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/20/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and approvalEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/20/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/15/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/18/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits; Volume V, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Thompson, Student Director, for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/23/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court at the University of Wyoming (Kirk Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Interim Director PAP; Eric Johnson, Director, PAP, and Eric Thompson, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Thompson for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/23/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/30/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/19/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/19/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/23/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/20/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal