judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARRYL A. MURRAY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1265
Short Caption:DARRYL A. MURRAY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-2942-09Filed Date:10/13/2010

Opening Event Date:10/13/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/30/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/29/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarryl A. Murray Y
Paul J. RileyYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Peter C. LallasNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Paul Riley, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/26/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Paul Riley, Esquire
11/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (281 pgs/Ronan) 5/24-26/10 proc cd attached
11/02/2010RECORD INDEX
11/02/2010RECORD COPIES
11/02/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (SEALED pleadings)
11/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
11/15/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript.
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (16 pgs/tape) 9/13/10 proc.
12/30/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 60 days. no oppo
02/17/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 16, 2011. (JAC)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 60 days
05/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 15, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (Castillo)
06/15/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo for 60 days
07/11/2011FiledOrder granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief.
08/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until November 14, 2011 (Appellant)
09/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to 11/14/11.
11/14/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/14/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/16/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
12/29/2011FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
03/07/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
03/07/2012FiledAffirmed
03/29/2012FiledMandate