judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JAMES R. NIX v. BOBBIE JEAN NIX

Case: A-2673
A-2673
04/27/1950
MISC PETITION
JAMES R. NIX
BOBBIE JEAN NIX
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/03/1950Reply to ResponseRelator
06/23/1950Motion for RehearingRelator
05/18/1950Response to Brief filedRelator
05/17/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/11/1950Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
04/27/1950Exhibits in case/cause filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/09/1950Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
07/21/1950Miscellaneous Motion
07/17/1950Affidavit filed
07/13/1950sheriff's return
07/03/1950Motion to Strike filed
07/03/1950Reply to Response
06/27/1950Response to Motion filed
06/23/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/14/1950Opinion issued
05/18/1950Response to Brief filed
05/17/1950Brief on the Merits
05/11/1950Exhibits in case/cause filed
05/01/1950sheriff's return
04/27/1950Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/27/1950motion for leave to file petitionFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bobbie Jean NixRespondent
James R. NixRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information