judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CHRIS DOBARD, ET AL. v. STATE OF TEXAS

Case: A-2675
A-2675
04/29/1950
MISC PETITION
CHRIS DOBARD, ET AL.
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/27/1950Appellees' Brief filed
06/02/1950Appellant's Brief filed
05/20/1950Exhibits in case/cause filed
04/29/1950Exhibits in case/cause filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/21/1950Letter Filed
10/18/1950Opinion issued
06/27/1950Appellees' Brief filed
06/02/1950Appellant's Brief filed
05/27/1950Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
05/20/1950Exhibits in case/cause filed
05/15/1950Response to Motion filed
05/08/1950Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
05/03/1950Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
04/29/1950Exhibits in case/cause filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Chris Dobard, et al.Appellant
State of TexasAppellee
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information