judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALHAJI SAMGBA MARRAH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1264
Short Caption:ALHAJI SAMGBA MARRAH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-5061-10Filed Date:10/08/2010

Opening Event Date:10/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/18/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlhaji S. Marrah Y
Andrew R. SzekelyYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kenechukwu O. Okocha NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Andrew Szekely, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/26/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Andrew Szekely, Esquire
11/03/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (59 pgs/Richer) 6/29/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (60-269 pgs/Richer) 6/30/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (270-461 pgs/Richer) 7/1/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (206 pgs/Rogers) 7/6/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (206-298 pgs/Rogers) 7/7/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (318 pgs/Rogers) 7/8/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (15 pgs/Burr) 9/14/10 proc. w/cd
03/08/2011RECORD INDEX
03/08/2011RECORD COPIES
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (462-650 pgs/Richer) 7/2/10 proc.
03/18/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/31/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 40 days from 5/10/11. no oppo
05/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 20, 2011. (JAC)
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/20/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
07/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/28/2011FiledOrder Granting appellee's motion for extension to 8/22/11.
08/16/2011FiledMotion To Remand (Appellee)
08/31/2011FiledOrder Granting Appelle's motion to vacate and remand case for re-sentencing.
08/31/2011FiledVacated
09/02/2011FiledMandate