judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEPT. BUSINESS & INDUSTRY VS. TOMKINS/LASCO

Case Information: 38235
Short Caption:DEPT. BUSINESS & INDUSTRY VS. TOMKINS/LASCOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A411613
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A430981
Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/03/2001 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/26/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/26/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12667
08/02/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-13107
08/03/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/06/2001Other Other. Mailed additional documents to settlement judge Kathleen M. Paustian.
09/05/2001MotionFiled Motion. 01-14954
11/08/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-18686
11/08/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-18687
11/16/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-19269
11/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). fn1[The September 5, 2001 motion to file an amicus curiae brief is denied as moot.] SNP/CLK 01-19557
11/21/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney James J. Jackson with the Thorndal Firm. Returned unfiled, the original Advanced Orthopedic Care Associates and Dr. Patrick McNulty's Brief of Amicus Curiae, received September 5, 2001.
11/21/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.