judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CMS OIL AND GAS COMPANY v. JULIE McCLAIN MORRIS

Case Heading (S-08-0104)
Case Number:S-08-0104Case Docketed On:05/19/2008
Linked To: S-08-0103
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Mines and Minerals (Title 30)
Short Title:CMS OIL AND GAS COMPANY v. JULIE McCLAIN MORRIS
Full Title:CMS OIL AND GAS COMPANY, Appellant (Defendant), v. JULIE McCLAIN MORRIS, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCMS Oil and Gas CompanyThomas Reese
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
Drake D. Hill
AppelleeJulie McClain MorrisPatrick G. Davidson
Rebecca Lynn Winkler

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Royalties
Opinion Number:2010 WY 37
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/19/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/19/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
07/03/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/01/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/19/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/20/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from the District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/16/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, eight volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Binders; Volume V, Deposition & Transcripts; Volume VI, exhibits; Volume VII, Binder; Volume VIII, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Davidson and Rebecca Winkler for appellant Morris.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas F. Reese for appellee CMS Oil and Gas CompanyNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/20/2008Order - Other - emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument, Justice Kite unavailableOrderOtherFinal
10/20/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (Patrick G. Davidson and Rebecca Lynn Winkler for appellant Morris; Thomas Reese for appellee CMS) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/25/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing and remanding in part, Justice Kite writing for the Court with Justice Golden filing a dissenting opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/12/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/12/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/15/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cards - Record signed for 4/14/10ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal