Case Information: 58248 | |||
Short Caption: | AMATI (TONY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35794 , 40604 , 62733 , 73577 , 73577-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C146961 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/22/2012 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/29/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/29/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. AMATI - C146961-1 | 11-12654 | |
05/09/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Enter Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 30 days. | 11-13616 | |
05/26/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on May 23, 2011. | 11-15507 | |
06/10/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Temporary Remand. District Court Order Appointing Counsel due: 35 days. | 11-17319 | |
06/22/2011 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of Court Minutes filed in district court on September 7, 2010. Response to 6/10/11 Order. | 11-18638 | |
06/22/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 11-18651 | |
07/11/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement - Criminal Appeals. | 11-20598 | |
07/14/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 11-21177 | |
07/25/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. | 11-22344 | |
10/27/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Due Date: 15 days. | 11-33180 | |
11/09/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Appellant. | 11-34593 | |
11/22/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Counsel shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a substitution that complies with NRAP 46(d)(2). Absent such a substitution and this court's approval, Mr. Yohey remains counsel of record for appellant. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. | 11-36086 | |
12/02/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorney. Kristina Wildeveld, Esq. substituting in place and stead of Paul Yohey, Esq. as counsel for appellant. Ms. Wildeveld was appointed by way of Order in the Eighth Judicial District Court on August 16/2011. | 11-37112 | |
01/20/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Ms. Wildeveld is now counsel of record for appellant. Appellant is represented by appointed counsel and has not sought or been granted leave to file documents in proper person. We therefore direct the clerk of this court to return the motion received on January 19, 2012. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. | 12-02064 | |
01/20/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Designation of Counsel. | 12-02129 | |
03/21/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | 12-08884 | |
03/21/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. | 12-08885 | |
04/20/2012 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 12-12725 | |
04/20/2012 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix. | 12-12726 | |
05/21/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. | 12-15929 | |
05/21/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion Approved. Reply Brief due June 21, 2012. | 12-15931 | |
06/22/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief. | 12-19618 | |
06/22/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | 12-19677 | |
06/22/2012 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. | ||
01/16/2013 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP13-MG/MD/NS | 13-01732 | |
02/11/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 13-04248 | |
02/11/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
02/28/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 22, 2013. | 13-04248 |