judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3655
B-3655
10/26/1972
Application for Writ of Error
W. D. AMASON, ET UX., ET AL.
WALTER J. WOODMAN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/17/1973Notice of Appeal filed
06/19/1973Notice of Appeal filedRespondent
05/16/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/13/1972Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/24/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
10/26/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/10/1973Opinion issued
11/17/1973Notice of Appeal filed
06/25/1973Response to Motion filed
06/25/1973Motion to Strike filed
06/25/1973Response to Motion filed
06/19/1973Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
06/19/1973Letter Filed
06/19/1973Notice of Appeal filed
06/18/1973Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
06/04/1973Response to Motion filed
05/16/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/02/1973Opinion issued
02/27/1973Motion to Strike filed
02/20/1973Miscellaneous Motion
01/24/1973Document received (See Remarks)
12/13/1972Reply to Response
11/24/1972Response to Petition
11/06/1972Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
10/26/1972Document received (See Remarks)
10/26/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Walter J. Woodman, et al.Respondent
W. D. Amason, et ux., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information