judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6127
A-6127
12/07/1956
Application for Writ of Error
MAGNOLIA PETROLEUM COMPANY
JOE HERMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/30/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/20/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/21/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/16/1957Response to Brief filedRespondent
01/11/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/20/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
12/07/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/30/1957Reply to Response
03/27/1957Response to Motion filed
03/20/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/21/1957Reply to Response
01/16/1957Response to Brief filed
01/11/1957Reply to Response
12/20/1956Response to Petition
12/07/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/07/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joe HermanRespondent
Magnolia Petroleum CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information