judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6123
A-6123
12/06/1956
Application for Writ of Error
ALLEN B. CROW
CITY OF SAN ANTONIO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/09/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/20/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/15/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
12/06/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/18/1957Response to Motion filed
05/09/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/09/1957Motion to Amend Filed
04/24/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
04/24/1957Opinion issued
02/20/1957Reply to Response
02/15/1957Response to Petition
01/23/1957Document received (See Remarks)
12/06/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/06/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of San Antonio by and through City Public Service Board of San AntonioRespondent
Allen B. CrowPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information