judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6109
A-6109
12/03/1956
Application for Writ of Error
MARY HARE STANLEY
THEODORE HAWKINS STANLEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/14/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/15/1956Response to Brief filedRespondent
12/10/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
12/08/1956Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/03/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/20/1957Response to Motion filed
02/14/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/15/1956Response to Brief filed
12/10/1956Response to Petition
12/08/1956Supplemental Brief filed
12/03/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/03/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mary Hare StanleyPetitioner
Theodore Hawkins StanleyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information