judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOLEMAN (MARVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33424
Short Caption:DOLEMAN (MARVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 56399
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C92959Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/07/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/04/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/04/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00251
12/21/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00454
04/01/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 5, 1999. 99-02410
04/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of this order, file and serve the transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. 99-02579
04/13/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-02794
05/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-03607
05/10/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed within 10 days from the date of this order. 99-03720
05/26/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Permit Late Filing of Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. 99-04347
05/27/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The opening brief and appendix provisionally submitted on May 26, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-04376
05/27/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. 99-04348
05/27/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-04349
06/25/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-05562
06/25/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 99-05563
07/15/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 27, 1999. 99-06350
08/27/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-08033
08/31/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The reply brief shall be served and file don or before September 6, 1999. 99-08188
02/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-01877
02/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Case submitted on the record and briefs this day.
03/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-04225
04/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-05808
04/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 26, 2000. 00-05808