judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ACHRAF BABA V. ANDREW S. GOLDSTEIN

Case Information: 10-CV-1284
Short Caption:ACHRAF BABA V. ANDREW S. GOLDSTEINClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB3974-08Filed Date:10/13/2010

Opening Event Date:10/13/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/04/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/26/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/02/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/11/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAchraf Baba N
Fred B. GoldbergYN
AppelleeAndrew S. Goldstein N
Thomas C. Green NN
David J. Ludlow YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/02/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 13, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
11/04/2010RECORD INDEX
11/04/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
12/23/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/23/2010APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
01/26/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/26/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/02/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/02/2011SUBMITTED before Judges Glickman, Oberly, Belson
07/20/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
08/11/2011FiledMandate