judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6111
A-6111
12/03/1956
Application for Writ of Error
GREAT WESTERN DRILLING COMPANY
RAY SIMMONS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/13/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/10/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
12/03/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/13/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/01/1957Opinion issued
02/27/1957Document received (See Remarks)
12/10/1956Response to Petition
12/03/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/03/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Great Western Drilling CompanyPetitioner
Ray SimmonsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information