judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6131
A-6131
12/12/1956
Application for Writ of Error
PAN AMERICAN HOTEL COMPANY, ET AL.
R. E. MORRISON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/28/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/15/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/22/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
12/12/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/09/1957Response to Motion filed
02/28/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/15/1957Reply to Response
12/22/1956Additional Copies received
12/22/1956Response to Petition
12/12/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/12/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. E. MorrisonRespondent
Pan American Hotel Company, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information