judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3662
B-3662
11/03/1972
Application for Writ of Error
DAIRYLAND COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS
LEONORE D. MARTINEZ AND HUSBAND, FRANCISCO MARTINEZ, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF RICARDO MARTINEZ, A MINOR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/24/1972Response to PetitionPetitioner
11/20/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
11/03/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/14/1972Response to Motion filed
12/07/1972Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
11/24/1972Response to Petition
11/20/1972Response to Petition
11/03/1972Conditional application for writ of error filed
11/03/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/03/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Leonore D. Martinez and husband, Francisco Martinez, individually and on behalf of Ricardo Martinez, a minorRespondent
Dairyland County Mutual Insurance Company of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information