judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3652
B-3652
10/24/1972
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS ON THE RELATION OF WILLIAM J. MCKIE
ROBERT D. BULLOCK, SECRETARY OF STATE, STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/17/1972Reply to ResponseRespondent
10/24/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/30/1973Document received (See Remarks)
03/07/1973Opinion issued
03/02/1973Response to Motion filed
11/17/1972Reply to Response
11/14/1972Response to Motion filed
11/09/1972Letter Filed
11/08/1972Motion to dismiss
10/24/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledDismissed
10/24/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of Texas on the relation of William J. McKiePetitioner
Robert D. Bullock, Secretary of State, State of Texas, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information