Case Information: 58246 | |||
Short Caption: | BALSAMO (STEPHANIE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51904 , 52235 , 58249 , 59600 , 59612 , 61289 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C224580 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/13/2011 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/28/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived | ||
04/28/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. BALSAMO - C224580. | 11-12586 | |
05/05/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due date: 10 days. Order Denying Motion and Order for Return of Seized Property filed on or about 05/02/2011. | 11-13372 | |
05/11/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Administratively Closing Appeal in Docket No. 58249. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close the appeal in Docket No. 58249 and transfer to Docket No. 58246 all documents filed or received in this matter. Nos. 58246/58249. | 11-14042 | |
05/11/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 58249). | 11-14045 | |
05/12/2011 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Order Denying Motion and Order for Return of Seized Property filed on 05/02/2011. | 11-14161 | |
06/10/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. | 11-17311 | |
07/13/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vols 1 thru 6. (via FTP) | 11-20950 | |
07/13/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/18/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation (PSI) Report (SEALED). | ||
11/17/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] (VACATED PER ORDER FILED 12/7/11) | 11-35553 | |
12/07/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Vacating Affirmance. We vacate this court's November 17, 2011 Order of Affirmance. | 11-37511 | |
02/24/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] | 12-06040 | |
03/21/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-08905 | |
03/21/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
04/02/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 29, 2012. | 12-08905 |