Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/28/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived - Criminal. | | |
04/28/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to all counsel.) | | 11-12519 |
04/28/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 11-12521 |
05/06/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement . Amended Case Appeal Statement | | 11-13451 |
05/09/2011 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Bail Pending Appeal. | | 11-13524 |
05/09/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing appellant, John J. Momot, Jr. Esq. | | 11-13527 |
05/09/2011 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Full Briefing Due to the Complexity of Issues and the Inability to Brief Issues Within Page Limits Imposed by NRAP 3C. | | 11-13528 |
05/09/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Appellant's Opening Brief Exceeding the 30 Page Limit Pursuant to NRAP 28(g). | | 11-13529 |
05/09/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 8/09, 8/10, 8/11, 8/12, 8/16, 8/17, 8/18, 8/19, 8/20, 8/23, 8/24, 8/25, 8/26, 8/27, 8/30, 8/31, 2011; 2/16/11. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. Filed in district court on: Not filed in district court. | | 11-13539 |
05/13/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Full Briefing and Denying Motion for Excess Pages. Opening Brief due: 120 days. The clerk of this court shall add John J. Momot, Jr. as counsel for appellant. | | 11-14238 |
05/18/2011 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Motion for Bail Pending Appeal. | | 11-14724 |
05/20/2011 | Motion | Filed Reply in Support of Appellant's Motion for Bail Pending Appeal. | | 11-14975 |
06/22/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Silvagio stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: February 16, 2011. | | 11-18540 |
07/13/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Bail.We remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of setting an approriate amount of bail pending appeal, imposing any special conditions for appellant's release that the district court deems appropriate, and for entry of an order staying the execution of the sentence upon the posting of bail. | | 11-21050 |
08/25/2011 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 11-25985 |
08/29/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 24, 2011. | | 11-26205 |
10/20/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Silvaggio stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/16/11. | | 11-32502 |
10/24/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Appellant's Opening Brief Exceeding the 30 Page Limit Pursuant to NRAP 28(g). | | 11-32876 |
10/25/2011 | Motion | Filed Amended Motion for Permission to File Appellant's Opening Brief Exceeding the 30 Page Limit Pursuant to NRAP 32(a)(7)(C). | | 11-32885 |
10/25/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Motion Approved. Opening Brief - 32 pages granted. | | 11-32899 |
10/27/2011 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 11-33221 |
10/27/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 14. | | 11-33223 |
11/28/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time for the Filing of Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 11-36361 |
11/28/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: December 28, 2011. | | 11-36363 |
12/28/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 11-39892 |
12/30/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief with CD-ROM Vols 1 & 2. | | 11-40151 |
01/17/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Receipt of Copy. | | 12-01680 |
01/27/2012 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 12-02953 |
01/27/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due February 27, 2012. | | 12-02956 |
02/27/2012 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 12-06104 |
02/28/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Reply Brief due: March 19, 2012. | | 12-06285 |
03/20/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 12-08875 |
03/20/2012 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
10/31/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP12-MD/MG/RP | | 12-34392 |
11/20/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 12-36766 |
11/21/2012 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 9537 returned to E. Brent Bryson Ltd. (Criminal appeal - no rehearing filing fee due.) | | |
11/29/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Revoke Bail Pending Appeal. | | 12-37688 |
12/03/2012 | Motion | Filed Opposition To Revoke Bail Pending Appeal. | | 12-37936 |
12/03/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Mailing Re: Opposition to Revoke Bail Pending Appeal. | | 12-37939 |
12/20/2012 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 12-40309 |
12/28/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 12-41178 |
01/25/2013 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | | 13-02680 |
02/01/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent filed a motion to revoke bail. Appellant opposed the motion. The motion is denied without prejudice. | | 13-03425 |
02/21/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 13-05466 |
02/21/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
03/14/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 6, 2013. | | 13-05466 |