judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3702
B-3702
12/05/1972
Application for Writ of Error
HARWELL AND HARWELL, INC.
RUBEN ROLAND RODRIGUEZ AND NATIONAL STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/11/1973Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/24/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/08/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/19/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
12/05/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/26/1973Response to Motion filed
06/11/1973Brief in Support of Petition
05/24/1973Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed
05/24/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/08/1973Reply to Response
12/19/1972Response to Petition
12/05/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/05/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ruben Roland Rodriguez and National Standard Insurance CompanyRespondent
Harwell and Harwell, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information