Case Information: 58207 | |||
Short Caption: | ANDRADE (MARTIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 58815 , 76727 , 76727-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C249370 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/17/2011 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/22/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/22/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. ANDRADE - C249370 | 11-11955 | |
05/09/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 11-13612 | |
05/19/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion to Vacate and Modify Judgment and Sentence. Filed in district court on: 5/4/11. (In Response to 5/9/11 Order) | 11-14757 | |
06/17/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol 1. | 11-17985 | |
06/17/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol 2. | 11-17986 | |
06/17/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol 3. | 11-17987 | |
06/17/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision | ||
06/22/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED). | ||
09/15/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn2[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] | 11-28104 | |
10/12/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-31338 | |
10/12/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/26/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 19, 2011. | 11-31338 |