judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3698
B-3698
12/04/1972
Application for Writ of Error
MISSOURI PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
DAVID L. CROSS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/04/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/14/1973Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/05/1973Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/21/1972Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/04/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/1974Letter Filed
08/26/1974Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
10/09/1973Response to Motion filed
10/04/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/19/1973Opinion issued
03/14/1973Supplemental Brief filed
03/05/1973Supplemental Brief filed
01/31/1973Document received (See Remarks)
01/31/1973Document received (See Remarks)
01/31/1973Document received (See Remarks)
01/31/1973Document received (See Remarks)
12/21/1972Brief on the Merits
12/04/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/04/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Missouri Pacific Railroad CompanyPetitioner
David L. CrossRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information