Case Information: 58222 | |||
Short Caption: | BRUNSON VS. AURORA LOAN SERVICES, LLC | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 56899 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0902885 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/31/2012 | How Submitted: | On Record And Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/25/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | ||
04/25/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) NOTICE OF APPEAL | 11-12092 | |
04/25/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. | 11-12094 | |
05/03/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Terry J. Thomas. Check No. 3631. | ||
05/05/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/25/11. To Court Reporter: Lori Urmston. | 11-13395 | |
05/05/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 11-13396 | |
05/11/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Terry Jenkins/Peggy Hoogs & Assoc. stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/25/11. | 11-14048 | |
06/23/2011 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 11-18735 | |
06/23/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vols 1 and 2 CD-ROM included. | 11-18737 | |
06/24/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. | 11-18863 | |
07/06/2011 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. | 11-20043 | |
07/21/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Answering Brief due: 30 days. | 11-22028 | |
08/16/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response. | 11-24871 | |
08/16/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to extend time to file answering brief is approved. Due date: September 19, 2011. | 11-24873 | |
09/19/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 11-28554 | |
10/03/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | 11-30071 | |
10/03/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | ||
01/31/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. | 12-03307 | |
01/31/2012 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/05/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Counsel. (Houser & Allison, APC substituted as attorney of record for respondent Auroa Loan Services, LLC in the place and stead of McCarthy & Holthus. | 12-06922 | |
03/07/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address of Attorney Terry J. Thomas. | 13-07002 | |
07/24/2013 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order." NNP13-JH/RP/MC | 13-21747 | |
08/19/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 13-24404 | |
08/19/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/30/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 26, 2013. | 13-24404 |