Case Information: 58236 | |||
Short Caption: | KNEBL (JOSEPH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C257608 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/27/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/27/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to all counsel.) KNEBL - C257608 | 11-12394 | |
04/27/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 11-12396 | |
05/06/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 1/19/11; 2/7/11; 2/23/11; 3/16/11; and 3/23/11. Court Reporter: Jessica Kirkpatrick. Filed in district court on: May 4, 2011. | 11-13490 | |
05/06/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 12/10/09; 5/4/10; 5/27/10; 6/3/10; and 9/14/10. Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. Filed in district court on: May 4, 2011. | 11-13491 | |
05/10/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. KNEBL - C257608 | 11-13924 | |
06/03/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Enlarge Time to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. | 11-16383 | |
06/08/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Transcripts and Granting Motion. Court Recorders Jessica Kirkpatrick and Rachelle Hamilton's Certificate of Delivery due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 40 days. | 11-16802 | |
06/09/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jessica Kirkpatrick stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/19/11, 2/07/11, 2/23/11, and 3/16/11. | 11-17212 | |
06/29/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Transcripts. Court Recorder Rachelle Hamilton's Certificate of Delivery due: 10 days. | 11-19337 | |
07/06/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter addressed to Joseph Knebl in response to proper person document received 6/30/11. | 11-20035 | |
07/13/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/10/09, 5/04/10, 5/27/10, 6/03/10, and 9/14/10. | 11-20913 | |
07/18/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 11-21626 | |
07/18/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volume 1. | 11-21627 | |
07/18/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volume 2. | 11-21634 | |
07/18/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volume 3. | 11-21631 | |
07/18/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volume 4. | 11-21635 | |
08/08/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 11-23736 | |
08/08/2011 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Fast Track Response Appendix. | 11-23737 | |
08/22/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Reply to Fast Track Response. | 11-25526 | |
08/22/2011 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. | ||
09/12/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued letter to Joseph Knebl in response to letter received 9/12/11. | 11-27644 | |
01/12/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn1[We decline to grant appellant permission to file documents in proper in this court. This court shall take no action and shall not consider the proper person documents Knebl has submitted to this court in this matter.] | 12-01260 | |
02/07/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-04086 | |
02/07/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
02/17/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 14, 2012. | 12-04086 |