Case Information: 58223 | |||
Short Caption: | JIM (DEVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - CR0035260 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/25/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. | ||
04/25/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to all counsel.) | 11-12191 | |
04/25/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 11-12193 | |
04/27/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 12/15/10, 2/10/11, 2/1/11. Court Reporter: Tonja Gill-Lemich. Filed in district court on: 4/15/11. | 11-12471 | |
05/04/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Anita Fillmore stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/15/10, 2/1/11, and 2/10/11. | 11-13216 | |
06/03/2011 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast track statement and appendix due: June 13, 2011. | 11-16311 | |
06/14/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 11-17673 | |
06/14/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 11-17674 | |
07/06/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 11-20029 | |
07/06/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 11-20032 | |
07/27/2011 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief Filed. | ||
01/12/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Fn1[In light of the disposition of this appeal, we deny Jim's request for full briefing and oral argument.] | 12-01207 | |
02/06/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-03876 | |
02/06/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
02/08/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 7, 2012. | 12-03876 |