Case Information: 58232 | |||
Short Caption: | BRYANT (SHAWNDELL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53102 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C245283 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/26/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/26/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Fast track notice issued to trial counsel.) BRYANT - C245283 | 11-12359 | |
04/26/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 11-12363 | |
05/06/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/16/10 Court Reporter: Lara Cochran Filed in district court on: May 4, 2011 | 11-13498 | |
05/06/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/23/08; 9/24/08 Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton Filed in district court on: May 4, 2011 | 11-13499 | |
05/06/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 12/18/08 Court Reporter: Renee Vincent Filed in district court on: May 4, 2011 | 11-13500 | |
05/11/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/18/08. | 11-13985 | |
06/03/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. | 11-16270 | |
06/07/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Transcripts and Granting Motion. Court Recorder Patricia Slattery's Certificate of Delivery due: 20 days. Court Recorder Lara Corcoran's Certificate of Delivery due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 40 days. | 11-16676 | |
06/17/2011 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Court Reporter Lara Corcoran's rough draft trancripts due: June 24, 2011. | 11-18123 | |
06/20/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/23/08 and 9/24/08. | 11-18175 | |
06/22/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service for transcripts of proceedings on September 16, 2010. | 11-18525 | |
07/18/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 11-21639 | |
07/18/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement -Bryant Appendix Volume 1. | 11-21640 | |
07/18/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement -Bryant Appendix Volume 2. | 11-21641 | |
07/18/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement -Bryant Appendix Volume 3. | 11-21642 | |
08/08/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 11-23837 | |
08/29/2011 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief Filed. | ||
01/12/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 12-01264 | |
02/07/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-04072 | |
02/07/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
02/17/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 14, 2012. | 12-04072 |