Case Information: 58210 | |||
Short Caption: | BROWN (JEFFREY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C259860 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/22/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/22/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Fast track notice issued to trial counsel.) BROWN - C259860 | 11-11974 | |
04/22/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 11-11976 | |
05/02/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 01/10/2011, 01/11/2011, 01/12/2011, and 03/24/2011. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. Not filed in district court. | 11-12933 | |
06/08/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. Due date: 10 days. | 11-16873 | |
06/16/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time (Fast Track Statement). | 11-17876 | |
06/24/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 60 days. | 11-18853 | |
07/13/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/10/11, 1/11/11, and 1/12/11. (Court Reporter can no longer assert that respondent will receive transcripts because of court's decision in Zuniga v. State, case no. 58267). | 11-20928 | |
08/23/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 08/26/2011). | ||
08/23/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appendix. | 11-25710 | |
08/26/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Striking Fast Track Statement Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall strike the fast track statement filed on August 23, 2011. Amended Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 15 days. | 11-26064 | |
09/13/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement. | 11-27724 | |
09/13/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 11-27725 | |
10/03/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Fast Track Response) | 11-30108 | |
10/06/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Fast Track Response due: October 24, 2011. | 11-30607 | |
10/20/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 11-32431 | |
11/10/2011 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief Filed. | ||
04/12/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP12C-MC/KP/JH. | 12-11686 | |
05/09/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-14574 | |
05/09/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
05/21/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 15, 2012. | 12-14574 |