Case Information: 58220 | |||
Short Caption: | SLAUGHTER (RICKIE) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48742 , 52385 , 54296 , 61991 , 68532 , 70676 , 70676-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C204957 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/25/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/25/2011 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Defendant Rickie Slaughter's Writ of Mandamus or in the Alternative Prohibition and Request for Stay of Proceedings. | 11-12076 | |
04/27/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Defendant's Writ of Mandamus or in the Alternative, Prohibition, and request of proceedings. | 11-12450 | |
05/05/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition." fn1[We deny petitioner's motion for stay of the district court proceedings filed on April 25, 2011.] | 11-13291 | |
05/31/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 11-15873 | |
05/31/2011 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |