Case Information: 58211 | |||
Short Caption: | ZIMMERMAN VS. SAXON MORTGAGE SERVICES, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1003464 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/22/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | ||
04/22/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) NOTICE OF APPEAL | 11-11977 | |
04/22/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. | 11-11979 | |
04/22/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/28/11; 2/18/11. To Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting | 11-11983 | |
04/25/2011 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Mark Mausert - check no. 1738. | ||
04/27/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/28/11; 2/18/11. To Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting. (Submitted by Appellant Counsel). | 11-12431 | |
05/03/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 11-12959 | |
05/03/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Second Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/25/2011. To Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting. | 11-13045 | |
05/31/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (Vu V. Ho and Aaron M. White of Cooper Castle Law Firm, LLP as counsel for respondent). | 11-15831 | |
06/01/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Stephanie Koetting stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/28/11, 2/18/11, and 3/25/11. | 11-15996 | |
08/18/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief. | 11-25195 | |
08/18/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due by September 20, 2011. | 11-25199 | |
09/20/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | 11-28676 | |
09/20/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. | 11-28680 | |
10/13/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief. | 11-31500 | |
10/13/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to extend time to file answering brief is approved. Due date: November 21, 2011. | 11-31522 | |
11/22/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 11-36073 | |
12/14/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | 11-38470 | |
12/14/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | ||
03/09/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." | 12-07700 | |
04/04/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-10674 | |
04/04/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
04/09/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 5, 2012. | 12-10674 |