judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3667
B-3667
11/06/1972
Application for Writ of Error
EMPLOYERS CASUALTY CO.
JOE TILLEY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/28/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/19/1973Post submission brief filedPetitioner
02/15/1973Post submission brief filedRespondent
02/05/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/30/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
11/06/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/16/1973Response to Motion filed
06/28/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/13/1973Concurring Opinion issued.
06/13/1973Opinion issued
02/19/1973Post submission brief filed
02/15/1973Post submission brief filed
02/05/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/10/1973Document received (See Remarks)
01/10/1973Document received (See Remarks)
11/30/1972Response to Petition
11/06/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/06/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hartford Accident and Indemnity CompanyAmicus Curiae
Joe Tilley, et al.Respondent
Employers Casualty Co.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information