judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3687
B-3687
11/22/1972
Application for Writ of Error
J. D. WILLIAMS
RAY ELLISON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/25/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/26/1973Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/06/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
11/22/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/09/1973Opinion issued
05/02/1973Response to Motion filed
04/25/1973Motion for Rehearing
04/11/1973Opinion issued
03/26/1973Supplemental Brief filed
01/31/1973Document received (See Remarks)
12/06/1972Response to Petition
11/22/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/22/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ray EllisonRespondent
J. D. WilliamsPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information