judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BACON (PERCY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 62026
Short Caption:BACON (PERCY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45615 , 45652 , 45975 , 45976 , 45983 , 46069 , 46576 , 47360 , 48147 , 48169 , 48399 , 50202 , 50403 , 50491 , 50600 , 50612 , 53420 , 53492 , 53767 , 53768 , 53804 , 53886 , 53915 , 53927 , 54102 , 54450 , 54479 , 54680 , 54741 , 54742 , 54874 , 55097 , 55440 , 55456 , 55540 , 55767 , 55778 , 56106 , 56449 , 56601 , 57017 , 57080 , 57214 , 57541 , 57659 , 57660 , 57661 , 58954 , 60161 , 61076 , 61280 , 61778 , 61779 , 61780 , 61803 , 61898 , 61899 , 61971 , 62043 , 62166 , 62240 , 62681 , 63217 , 64428 , 67110 , 67701 , 67802 , 67803 , 67804 , 67824 , 68012 , 68159 , 68639 , 68852 , 78120
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C212233Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/13/2012How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/02/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/02/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 12-34630
11/09/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 12-35470
12/12/2012Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-21 (via ftp). 12-39288
12/13/2012Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
12/17/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report pages 679-689 of ROA (SEALED).
12/17/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report pages 338-341 of ROA (SEALED).
07/23/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn2[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] NNP13- JH/RP/MC. 13-21658
09/25/2013Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). 13-28673
10/24/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 13-32083
10/24/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/04/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 30, 2013. 13-32083