Case Information: 58215 | |||
Short Caption: | MARTINEZ (FREDYS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49608 , 55890 , 56153 , 57197 , 58023 , 58050 , 69277 , 69596 , 70244 , 70641 , 75760 , 75760-COA , 79405 , 81529 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C226586 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/22/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/22/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. MARTINEZ - C226586 | 11-12023 | |
04/27/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes (SEALED). | ||
05/11/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." | 11-14035 | |
06/09/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-17082 | |
06/09/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
06/22/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 15, 2011. | 11-17082 |