Case Information: 58214 | |||
Short Caption: | STEPHENS (ROBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 56341 , 60506 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C262980 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/17/2011 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/22/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/22/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. STEPHENS - C262980 | 11-12022 | |
05/09/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 11-13614 | |
05/26/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on May 12, 2011. | 11-15509 | |
06/17/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol 1. | 11-18040 | |
06/17/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/22/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report (SEALED). | ||
09/15/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-28146 | |
10/12/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-31302 | |
10/12/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/26/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 19, 2011. | 11-31302 |