judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LUBLIN VS. LAWSON (CHILD CUSTODY) C/W 58673/59276/59447

Case Information: 58213
Short Caption:LUBLIN VS. LAWSON (CHILD CUSTODY) C/W 58673/59276/59447Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:58213*, 58673 , 59276 , 59447 Related Case(s): 55900 , 57485 , 58068 , 58673 , 59276 , 59447
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D344245Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/04/2011How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/22/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Abraham Lublin check no. 587.
04/22/2011Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.)
05/03/2011Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. 11-13039
05/03/2011MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Stay-Child Custody. 11-13040
05/05/2011BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement on Order Donna's House Order dated March 24, 2011. 11-13393
05/23/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Transcript Notice. Transcripts 12/30/09, 2/10/10, 3/24/11 (SEALED). (Filed in 57485, 58068 and 58213-cases are not consolidated.)
05/24/2011TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/30/09, 2/10/10, and 3/24/11. 11-15269
05/25/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice. Appellant's Supplement Affidavit 5 with attached exhibits. (Filed in 57485, 58068 and 58213-cases are not consolidated). 11-15422
05/26/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Certificate of Service: Appellants Transcript Notice for Hearings; Appellant's Supplement Affidavit 5 for Case Nos. 57485/58068/58213; Civil Proper Person Statement for Case No. 58068; and Civil Proper Person Statement for Case No. 58213. Nos. 57485/58068/58213. 11-15610
05/27/2011Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appellants Supplement Affidavit with Exhibits and CD. 11-15790
06/30/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice on Non-Representation. (Mary D. Perry does not represent respondent April Lawson in this case). 11-19445
07/18/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Stay and Consolidating Appeals. If appellant submits an appeal statement with attachments, the clerk of this court is directed to reject the submission and return it, unfiled. If appellant submits any documents other then those expressly permitted by this order, the clerk is directed to return them, unfiled. Fn1[We note that attorney Mary Perry does not represent respondent on appeal, and we therefore direct the clerk to remove her as counsel on this court's docket.] Nos. 58213/58673 11-21570
08/04/2011BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement (Docket No. 58673). 11-23528
08/08/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice - Certificate of Mailing - Civil Proper Person Statement on Order dated June 9, 2011. 11-23825
09/06/2011Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. 11-26983
10/07/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. Nos. 58213/58673 11-30805
10/24/2011MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Consolidate Appeals for Nevada Supreme Court Cases 58673, 58213, 59276, 59447. 11-32780
10/24/2011Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Case Summary and Registry of Actions for District Court Case D344245. 11-32791
11/04/2011Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 31 (SEALED). Nos. 58213/58673.
11/04/2011Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
12/06/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to appellant Abraham Lublin, returning, unfiled, the document entitled "Motion for Notice of Letter of Appeal from Sister Lorraine Forster of St Ann Catholic Church". Nos. 58213/58673. 11-37284
02/03/2012MotionFiled Proper Person Motion Seeking Leave to File Review of Respondent's Criminal Transgressions and Convictions as Filed in the Inter-Related Cases 59276 & 59447. Nos. 58213/58673. 12-03711
02/15/2012MotionFiled Proper Person Motion Seeking Leave to File Review of the Minor Children Adrienna and Alexander Lublin Failing Grades and School Reports with John C Bass Elementary School While Only in Respondent's Care: as of February 2012. Filed in Inter Related Cases 59276 & 59447. Nos. 58213/58673. 12-05012
04/10/2012MotionFiled Proper Person Motion Seeking Leave to File Review of Appellant was Denied an Evidentiary Hearing in Addition Appellant and Family Members ZERO Contact and ZERO Phone Contact With Minor Children for OVER a YEAR, in Addition to Children's Failing Grades While in Respondents Primary Care Feb 2012 All of Which Filed in Inter Related Cases 59276/59447. Nos. 58213/58673. 12-11389
05/01/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Stay, Granting Motion to Consolidate Appeals, and Directing Transmission of Record. Appellant has filed proper person motions for stay and stipulations for child support to "never be reassessed for both parties" in Docket No. 59276 and Docket No. 59447. we deny the motions and disapprove the stipulations. We grant appellant's request and we hereby consolidate Docket Nos. 58213, 58673, 59276, and 59447. Within 30 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a sealed, certified copy of any trial court records beyond volume 31 in District Court Case No. D344245. We remind appellant that in our July 18, 2011, order we barred appellant from filing any document without first seeking leave to do so. That order remains in effect. Nos. 58213/58673/59276/59447 12-13683
05/14/2012Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vols 32 thru 34 (SEALED). Nos. 58213/58673/59276/59447.
09/10/2012Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter Re: False Supreme Court Order submitted to NCSD. Nos. 58673/59276/59447. 12-28525
03/14/2013MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Clarefy Roll of Nevada Supreme Court in Child Support Case No: R-10-159558-R and R-07-142576-R For These Two Parts. Nos. 58673/59276/59447. 13-07710
03/18/2013Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn4[We have reviewed appellant's remaining contentions, and we conclude they are without merit. We deny appellant's February 3, 2012, February 15, 2012, and April 10, 2012, motions. We deny respondent's March 14, 2013, motion. We have reviewed all of the additional documentation submitted in these appeals. We have reviewed respodnent's September 10, 2012, letter.] SNP13-MG/MD/NS Nos. 58213/58673/59276/59447 13-08052
04/05/2013Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing (Appellant). Nos. 58213/58673/59276/59447. 13-09970
04/05/2013AppendixFiled Appendix - Appellant's Supplement Affidavit Exhibits for Petition for Re Hearing. Nos. 58213/58673/59276/59447. 13-09971
04/05/2013Filing FeeRehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Abraham Lublin - check no. 5024.
04/12/2013MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Dismiss Cases Above With Predigest. . 58213/58673/59276/59447. 13-10922
04/19/2013MotionFiled Proper Person Opposition to Respondent Motion to Dismiss Cases above with Predigest with Substantiated Proof. Nos. 58213/59276/59447. 13-11634
05/14/2013MotionFiled Proper Person Motion Seeking Leave to File Review of Supreme Court Rule that ABOLISHES use of PARENT COORDINATORS, Please Comport to Supreme Court Rule. Appellant was DENIED an Evidentiary Hearing and Due Process, in Addition Appellant and Family Members ZERO Contact and ZERO Phone Contact with Minor Children for OVER (2) TWO Years Now, All of Which Filed in Inter Related Cases. Nos. 59276/59447/58213/58673. 13-14236
05/14/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service. 13-14248
06/03/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address of Abraham Lublin. 13-16210
06/11/2013Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "We deny the petition." NRAP 40(c). In light of this order, respondent's motion to dismiss this matter and appellant's opposition to that motion are denied as moot. Having reviewed appellant's May 14, 2013, motion to stay and his motion for leave to seek review, we conclude that these motions lack merit, and we deny them. The clerk of this court shall file appellant's stay motion, which was provisionally received in this court on May 14, 2013. Nos. 58213/58673/59276/59447 13-16999
06/11/2013MotionFiled Proper Person MOTION FOR STAY with SUBSTANATIATED PROOF for Orders including Order Dated March 18, 2013. 13-17001
07/08/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 58213/58673/59276/59447 13-19790
07/08/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 58213/58673/59276/59447
07/19/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 12, 2013. 13-19790
09/12/2013Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed August 26, 2013 and placed on the docket as Case No. 13-6214. Nos. 58213/58673/59276/59447. 13-27025
11/18/2013Other Incoming DocumentFiled Notice of Order filed at the Supreme Court of the United States, denying petitioners request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. 13-34639