Case Information: 62010 | |||
Short Caption: | COX. VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 11OC002671B | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/31/2012 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. In Forma Pauperis. | ||
10/31/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 12-34416 | |
10/31/2012 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on September 7, 2011. (Granting in forma pauperis.) | 12-34417 | |
01/15/2013 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order/Voluntary Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal. Proper person appellant's November 13, 2013, motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal is granted. Accordingly, "this appeal is hereby dismissed," with the parties to bear their own costs and fees. Fn1[The clerk of this court is directed to file appellant's motion, which was provisionally received on November 13, 2012.] Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. | 13-01635 | |
01/15/2013 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion of Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal. | 12-35883 |