Case Information: 62003 | |||
Short Caption: | WARDEN VS. HEIMAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 50295 , 53736 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR062599 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/30/2012 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
10/30/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.) | 12-34280 | |
10/30/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Rough Draft Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 12-34282 | |
11/09/2012 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript. | 12-35542 | |
12/10/2012 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: December 17, 2012. | 12-38807 | |
12/18/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Fast Track Statement). | 12-39952 | |
12/20/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: January 16, 2013. | 12-40277 | |
01/16/2013 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 13-01830 | |
01/16/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume I. | 13-01831 | |
01/16/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume II. | 13-01832 | |
01/16/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume III. | 13-01833 | |
01/28/2013 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 13-02907 | |
01/28/2013 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 13-02916 | |
02/11/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave of Court to File Fast Track Reply in Excess of Five Pages. | 13-04324 | |
02/22/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The State has filed a motion to file a fast track reply in excess of five pages/the type-volume limitation. The motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall reject the fast track reply received via E-Flex on February 11, 2013. The State shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve a fast track reply. | 13-05630 | |
03/04/2013 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply to Fast Track Response. | 13-06635 | |
03/04/2013 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. | ||
09/18/2013 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP13-MG/MD/NS | 13-27743 | |
10/16/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 13-30995 | |
10/16/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/06/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 31, 2013. | 13-30995 |