judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RHOMBIC CORP VS. NEVADA AGENCY & TRUST

Case Information: 33422
Short Caption:RHOMBIC CORP VS. NEVADA AGENCY & TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34465
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9802657Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Gruesen, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/03/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from J.T. Cardinalli--check no. 0362.
12/03/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00240
12/15/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 on cross-appeal from Woodburn & Wedge--check no. 51428.
12/15/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 98-00386
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas W. Gruesen, Sr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/31/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00590
01/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Docketing statement from respondent/cross-appellant due: 10 days. 99-00185
01/22/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Docketing Statement of Respondent/Cross-Appellant 99-00457
02/12/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-01012
02/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended 99-01308
03/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Both appellant and cross appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal and cross-appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The preparation of transcripts and briefing scheduled shall remains suspended pending further order of this court. 99-01814
04/14/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent Rockford's Brief Regarding Jurisdictional Defects. 99-02908
04/14/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Points and Authorities in Support of Jurisdiction of the Court with Regard to the Appeal of Rhombic. 99-02913
05/11/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: " . . . we dismiss this appeal and cross-appeal for lack of jurisdiction, without prejudice to the parties' right to appeal after a final judgment has been entered." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-03816
06/08/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-04815
06/08/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/11/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 10, 1999. 99-04815