judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DARIN C. BAREKMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0119)
Case Number:S-08-0119Case Docketed On:06/02/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DARIN C. BAREKMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DARIN C. BAREKMAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDarin C. BarekmanDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Search Warrant
Opinion Number:2009 WY 13
Citation:200 P.3d 802 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/02/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/18/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/29/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/02/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/19/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal freom district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - index for transmitted record on appealNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paul Rehurek for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/21/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Paul S. Rehurek, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/05/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/24/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/26/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/25/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal